ND 1195 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to imprisonment of minors; to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 12.1-20-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gross sexual imposition; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gross sexual imposition; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
2017-04-07HouseConcurred
2017-03-17HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-16SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-02-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback