ND 1194 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Emergency clause carried
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 50-24.1-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical assistance tribal health care coordination agreements; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance tribal health care coordination agreements; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateEmergency clause carried
2019-04-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4
2019-04-24SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 26, Emergency clause carried
2019-04-24HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-09SenateAppoint Sen. Hogan to replace Sen. O. Larsen on conference committee
2019-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Anderson K. Roers O. Larsen
2019-04-01HouseConference committee appointed Rohr D. Anderson Dobervich
2019-04-01HouseRefused to concur
2019-03-26HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-25SenateEmergency clause carried
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1
2019-03-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-08SenateAmendment adopted
2019-03-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-27SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 11, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 1 2
2019-02-11HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2019-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1194.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-04001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-06001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-06002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0401-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-33.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-52.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-74.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-74.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback