ND 1194 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to providing a victim's rights card; and to amend and reenact subsections 6 and 10 of section 12.1-34-01, subsections 1, 2, and 6 of section 12.1-34-02, and subsection 1 of section 12.1-34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to treatment standards for victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment standards for victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-07SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-06SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3
2017-04-06HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-04HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-03-31SenateConference committee appointed Luick Osland Nelson
2017-03-30HouseConference committee appointed Klemin Blum Hanson
2017-03-30HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-27HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
2017-01-18HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 10:10
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1194.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0474-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0474-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0474-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0474-02002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0474-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0474-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-11.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-54.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-63.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-64.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback