ND 1193 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a living wage mandate prohibition for political subdivisions; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A living wage mandate prohibition for political subdivisions; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseSigned by Governor 03/26
2019-03-21HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-20SenateSigned by President
2019-03-19HouseReturned to House
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
2019-03-15SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 20
2019-02-15HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2019-02-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback