ND 1193 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting economic harm; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-31-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disorderly conduct; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disorderly conduct; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
2017-03-27SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2017-02-13SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-06SenateReceived from House
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 19, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:40
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback