ND 1189 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to casting ballots; and to amend and reenact sections 16.1-15-02 and 16.1-15-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the canvass report requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The canvass report requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32
2021-03-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-19SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 29
2021-02-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
2021-02-11HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback