ND 1189 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 54-44.7-03 and section 54-44.7-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to procurement procedures and exceptions to bidding thresholds for state building projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement procedures and exceptions to bidding thresholds for state building projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0
2017-04-05HouseConcurred
2017-03-28HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-27SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-27SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2017-01-20HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback