ND 1188 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 65-05-09.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the termination of benefits upon retirement; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The termination of benefits upon retirement; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseSigned by Governor 03/13
2019-03-12HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-11SenateSigned by President
2019-03-08HouseReturned to House
2019-03-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-03-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-30SenateReceived from House
2019-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback