ND HB1188 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to chapter 54-21.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disclosure of known radon hazards.
Title
Disclosure of known radon hazards.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. George Keiser [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 76 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |