ND 1186 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 47 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disclosure of radon hazards by a seller.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of radon hazards by a seller.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53
2017-02-02HouseReconsidered
2017-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 43
2017-01-30HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 5 3
2017-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback