ND HB1184 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 5-02-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibitions for an individual under twenty-one years of age; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Prohibitions for an individual under twenty-one years of age; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. David Richter [R] |
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Governor 03/17 |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 15 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |