ND 1184 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 5 and 7 of section 39-06.1-06, paragraph? 33 of subdivision a of subsection 3 of section 39-06.1-10, and subdivisions? g,? h,? and? i of subsection 1 of section 39-09-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statutory fees, entries against driving record, and speed limitations; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statutory fees, entries against driving record, and speed limitations; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 6 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 84
2017-01-30HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback