ND 1183 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-20-12.1, subsection 2 of section 12.1-20-12.2, and subsection 4 of section 12.1-27.2-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to indecent exposure toward minors, surreptitious intrusion, and sexual performances by children; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indecent exposure toward minors, surreptitious intrusion, and sexual performances by children; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Governor 04/14
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 7
2017-04-07HouseConcurred
2017-03-24HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 7
2017-01-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 3
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:40
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback