ND 1182 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-09-08 and 16.1-11-08, subsection 1 of section 16.1-11-11, subsection 1 of section 16.1-11-16, and sections 16.1-11-19, 16.1-11-24, and 40-21-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permitting party designations for candidates for county and local elections; and to repeal section 40-21-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to party designations for candidates for municipal offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Party designations for candidates for municipal offices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 36 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 55
2021-02-01HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback