ND HB1182 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 40-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of property tax incentives granted by a city; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 40-57.1-03, section 40-58-20.2, and subsection 3 of section 54-35-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of property tax incentives granted by a city and evaluation of economic development tax incentives; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Approval of property tax incentives granted by a city and evaluation of economic development tax incentives; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-17 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 41 |
2017-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |