ND 1181 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to to create and enact section 12.1-04-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a defendant's fitness to proceed; and to amend and reenact sections 12.1-04-04, 12.1-04-06, 12.1-04-07, and 12.1-04-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a defendant's fitness to proceed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A defendant's fitness to proceed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2021-04-16HouseConcurred
2021-04-01HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-29SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2021-03-26SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-18SenateReceived from House
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-02-08HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1181.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-01001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-02001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-03001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0480-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-56.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-67.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback