ND 1179 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-28-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gambling offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gambling offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 50
2017-01-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 2
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback