ND 1178 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of veterans' affairs for stand down events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of veterans' affairs for stand down events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92
2019-02-14HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 19 0 2
2019-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-10HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-01-10HouseRequest return from committee
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback