ND 1178 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-17.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a statewide interoperable radio network fund; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 37-17.3-02.2, subsection 4 of section 54-59-05, section 57-40.6-02, and subsection 1 of section 57-40.6-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statewide interoperability executive committee, the powers and duties of the information technology department, the assessed communications service fee, and the prepaid wireless emergency 911 fee; to authorize borrowing authority; to provide an appropriation; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for a budget section report; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The statewide interoperability executive committee, the powers and duties of the information technology department, the assessed communications service fee, and the prepaid wireless emergency 911 fee; to authorize borrowing authority; to provide an appropriation; to provide statements of legislative intent; to provide for a budget section report; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Governor 04/25
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-18SenateSigned by President
2017-04-18SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-14HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-14SenateConference committee appointed Bekkedahl Laffen Cook
2017-04-13HouseConference committee appointed Olson Nathe Headland
2017-04-13HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-12HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-04-12SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 31 nays 16
2017-04-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 3 2 1
2017-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2017-04-03SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 3 2 1
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 12
2017-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback