ND 1175 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to business immunity from COVID-19 liability claims; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business immunity from COVID-19 liability claims; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseSigned by Governor 04/23
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-15SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7
2021-04-15SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 15, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-13HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-12HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Klein Vedaa Marcellais
2021-04-05HouseConference committee appointed Nehring Lefor Stemen
2021-04-05HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-18HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-17SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-03-17SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
2021-03-16SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateReceived from House
2021-02-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 17, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback