ND HB1175 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 21-10-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the membership of the state investment board.
Title
The membership of the state investment board.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 31 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 22 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |