ND HB1175 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permits for dredging.
Title
Permits for dredging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6 |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 2 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |