ND HB1175 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an acute cardiovascular emergency medical system.
Title
An acute cardiovascular emergency medical system.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] |
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 22 0 0 |
2013-02-11 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |