ND 1172 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 6-09.10-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agricultural mediation and negotiation services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural mediation and negotiation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 5 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 89
2021-02-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-12HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback