ND 1171 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee Hearing 08:30
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 8:30 am in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the development and implementation of a skilled workforce scholarship program; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The development and implementation of a skilled workforce scholarship program; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a transfer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-03-21SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-21SenateAmendment adopted
2019-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee
2019-02-12SenateReceived from House
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
2019-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback