ND 1171 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15-10-18.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extending the benefits of free tuition at state institutions of higher education to a stepchild of a peace officer killed in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the benefits of free tuition at state institutions of higher education to a stepchild of a peace officer killed in the line of duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-21HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-16SenateSigned by President
2017-03-15HouseReturned to House
2017-03-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-13SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2017-01-20HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback