ND 1168 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 44-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restricting compensation and travel reimbursement for public employees for attendance at legislative meetings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricting compensation and travel reimbursement for public employees for attendance at legislative meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 5 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 86
2017-02-10HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback