ND HB1167 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of property tax equity and the creation of a central taxing authority.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of property tax equity and the creation of a central taxing authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Dave Nehring [R] |
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |