ND 1166 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 4.1-73-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to freeze branding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freeze branding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by Governor 03/08
2019-03-06HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-05SenateSigned by President
2019-03-04HouseReturned to House
2019-03-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0
2019-02-28SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2019-02-28SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2019-01-23SenateReceived from House
2019-01-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2019-01-17HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2019-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback