ND 1165 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-60.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transparency of state grants; and to amend and reenact section 54-60.1-01, subdivision g of subsection 3 of section 54-60.1-03, and section 54-60.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transparency of state grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transparency of state grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
2017-03-23SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 10
2017-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 3 2
2017-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback