ND HB1165 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-60.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transparency of state grants; and to amend and reenact section 54-60.1-01, subdivision g of subsection 3 of section 54-60.1-03, and section 54-60.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transparency of state grants.
Title
Transparency of state grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 10 |
2017-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 3 2 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |