ND HB1164 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new subsections to section 19-03.1-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to drug court participation; to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 12.1-32-02 and section 39-08-01.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to drug court participation; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Drug court participation; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 15 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |