ND 1163 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-01-44 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the needle exchange program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The needle exchange program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 50 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-02SenateReceived from House
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 50 nays 42
2021-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback