ND 1163 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to repeal sections 12.1-30-01, 12.1-30-02, and 12.1-30-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Sunday closing laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunday closing laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 44 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 25
2017-03-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-03SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 46
2017-01-31HouseReconsidered
2017-01-30HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 50
2017-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-11HouseRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2017-01-11HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback