ND 1162 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of competition between government and private industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of competition between government and private industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
2017-03-15SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
2017-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8
2017-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback