ND 1161 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting inaccurate information from being entered into a telephone caller identification system with the intent to defraud; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting inaccurate information from being entered into a telephone caller identification system with the intent to defraud; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseSigned by Governor 04/10
2019-04-05HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President
2019-04-02HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2019-04-02HouseConcurred
2019-03-15HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-14SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-03-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
2019-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2019-02-12HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-07HouseRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2019-02-05HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2019-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback