ND HB1161 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-27-23, 54-44.1-03, 54-44.1-12, and 54-44.1-12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the control over the rate of expenditures.
Title
The control over the rate of expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] | Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 6 3 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |