ND HB1161 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 53-06.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to wagers for the game of twenty-one.
Title
Wagers for the game of twenty-one.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. William Kretschmar [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by Governor 03/18 |
2015-03-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 12 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 28 |
2015-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |