ND HB1161 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Game and fish department licenses; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Glen Froseth [R] | Rep. Bob Hunskor [D] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] | Sen. Mac Schneider [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Governor 04/02 |
2013-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |