ND HB1160 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 26.1-34.2-01.1, 26.1-34.2-02, 26.1-34.2-03, 26.1-34.2-03.1, 26.1-34.2-04, and 26.1-34.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to annuity transaction practices; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Annuity transaction practices; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |