ND 1159 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-04-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to clearly displaying letters and numbers on motor vehicle plates and the display of number plates on a motorcycle or trailer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clearly displaying letters and numbers on motor vehicle plates and the display of number plates on a motorcycle or trailer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/04
2017-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 10
2017-03-31HouseConcurred
2017-03-16HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-15SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3
2017-03-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 54 nays 39
2017-01-13HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback