ND 1158 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-04-10.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the fee for personalized motor vehicle number plates; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The fee for personalized motor vehicle number plates; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 75
2017-01-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-13HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback