ND 1157 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 57-15-19.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to township excess levies for emergency purposes; and to amend and reenact section 57-15-20.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exceptions to tax levy limitations in townships; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exceptions to tax levy limitations in townships; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2021-03-18HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-16SenateSigned by President
2021-03-15HouseReturned to House
2021-03-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3
2021-03-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-01SenateReceived from House
2021-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 16
2021-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback