ND 1157 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 43 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the physical therapy licensure compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The physical therapy licensure compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseSigned by Governor 03/13
2017-03-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-09HouseReturned to House
2017-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-27HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
2017-01-23HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-11HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback