ND HB1157 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to elected public officials and concealed weapons at publicly owned or operated buildings; and to amend and reenact section 62.1-01-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions.
Title
Definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 47 |
2015-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 0 |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:25 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |