ND 1156 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 65-01-02, subsection 8 of section 65-05-07, and section 65-05-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of medical marijuana and prohibiting the payment of workers' compensation benefits for medical marijuana; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of medical marijuana and prohibiting the payment of workers' compensation benefits for medical marijuana; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-07HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-10HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-09SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 8
2017-03-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
2017-01-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback