ND 1155 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 19-03.4-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to marijuana paraphernalia; to amend and reenact sections 19-03.1-22.3, 19-03.1-23, 19-03.1-23.1, 19-03.4-03, 19-03.4-04, 19-03.4-05, and subsection 29 of section 40-05-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of marijuana and marijuana paraphernalia; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of marijuana and marijuana paraphernalia; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 43 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 47
2019-02-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback