ND 1152 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-12-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cigar bars and lounges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigar bars and lounges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 24
2021-03-22SenateReported back without recommendation 6 0 0
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-18SenateReceived from House
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 45
2021-02-10HouseReported back without recommendation 12 2 0
2021-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-13HouseRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2021-01-13HouseRequest return from committee
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback