ND HB1152 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-27-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state foundation aid payments to school districts.
Title
State foundation aid payments to school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |