ND 1151 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 38-08-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the reporting of well pad or oil and gas production facility fluid spills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The reporting of well pad or oil and gas production facility fluid spills.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Governor 04/07
2017-04-07HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-28HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-27SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 31 nays 14
2017-03-27SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2017-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 11
2017-01-24HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-23HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback